Uniac, Patricia Elizabeth (CPSO#: 96512)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Box 69
105 Shipley St.
Clinton ON  N0M 1L0
Phone: (519) 482-3000
Fax: (519)482-7648
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PATRICIA ELIZABETH UNIAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNIAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2013