skip to content

Unger, Zoe Meredith

CPSO#: 91444

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dartmouth Medical School, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain
Management
399 Bathurst Street Room MCL 2-405
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5118 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

30 The Queensway
St. Joseph's Hospital
Dept. of Anesthesia
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: (416) 530-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Zoe Unger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Unger ( CPSO# 91444 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia and Pain Management
Room MCL 2-405
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5118

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZOE MEREDITH UNGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 15 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014