skip to content

Unger, Mark Anthony

CPSO#: 84719

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Danish, English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Fletcher Cres
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Canada
Phone: (705) 435-6281
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

21 Bedford Rd
Toronto ON  M5R 2J9
Canada
Phone: (416) 944-9393
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1 Kenton Dr
North York ON  M2R 2H6
Canada
Phone: 647-932-7913
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mark A. Unger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Unger ( CPSO# 84719 )

Business Address:
200 Fletcher Crescent
Alliston ON  L9R 1W7
Phone Number: (705) 435-6281

Business Address:
1 Kenton Drive
North York ON  M2R 2H6
Phone Number: (647) 932-7913

Business Address:
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Business Address:
21 Bedford Road
Toronto ON  M5R 2J9
Phone Number: (416) 944-9393

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 06 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK ANTHONY UNGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UNGER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2008