skip to content

Une, Dai

CPSO#: 97230

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Okayama Medical University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Jan 2012 to 18 Apr 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 19 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 03 Jan 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014