skip to content

Umasuthan, Nishani

CPSO#: 98092

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5-1333 Kennedy Rd
Scarborough Academic Family Health
Scarborough ON  M1P 2L6
Phone: 416-264-4446
Fax: 416-264-4456 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

60 Guildwood Pky
Extendicare Guildwood
Scarborough ON  M1E 1N9
Canada
Phone: (416) 266-7711
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough Health Network - Centen
Complex Continuing Care
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Canada
Phone: (416) 284-8131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nishani Umasuthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Umasuthan ( CPSO# 98092 )

Business Address:
Scarborough Academic Family Health Centre
1125 Markham Road
Toronto ON  M1H 2Y5
Phone Number: (416) 264-4446

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NISHANI UMASUTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UMASUTHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014