skip to content

Ulloa Gomez, Jose Liborio

CPSO#: 96888

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Apr 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Apr 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:UNIVERSIDAD DEL CAUCA, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2011 to 14 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Dec 2011 to 30 Apr 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2012