skip to content

Ullah, Saif

CPSO#: 92580

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Saif Ullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Corporation Name: Dr.Samreen Malik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017
Corporation Name: Dr. Saif Ullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 28 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ullah ( CPSO# 92580 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Ave
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Dec 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:24 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAIF ULLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ULLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 22 Mar 2010 to 04 Apr 2010
EL - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2012

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: June 20, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)