skip to content

Ul Haq, Huma Zia

CPSO#: 89725

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greengate Medical Centre
170 Silvercreek Parkway N, Unit 2
Guelph ON  N1H 7P7
Phone: (519) 265-8882
Fax: 226-486-0172 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ul Haq Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Ul Haq ( CPSO# 89725 )

Business Address:
Suite 4
370 Eastbridge Boulevard
Waterloo ON  N2K 4P1

Business Address:
Greengate Medical Centre
2-170 Silvercreek Parkway North
Guelph ON  N1H 7P7
Phone Number: (519) 265-8882

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Sep 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUMA ZIA UL HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UL HAQ is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010