skip to content

Uhm, Jieun

CPSO#: 92294

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Chungnam National University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Dec 2009 to 10 Feb 2010
PEAP - CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 11 Feb 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jan 2014
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Jan 2015