skip to content

Udovic, Lisa Ann

CPSO#: 90656

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Wilson, Lisa Ann (used until: 15 Oct 2009 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oakville Trafalgar Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate ,
Oakville, Ontario
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone: (905) 845-2571 Ext. 4647 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Udovic Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Udovic ( CPSO# 90656 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:07 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LISA ANN UDOVIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDOVIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 15 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2011 to 15 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2012 to 17 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 17 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 17 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 18 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 17 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016