Tytus, Stephen (CPSO#: 96886)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
248 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 1K7
Phone: (289) 757-2287
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

700 Main St E
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Canada
Phone: (905) 545-1376
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Tytus Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tytus ( CPSO# 96886 )

Business Address:
700 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1K7
Phone Number: (905) 545-1376

Business Address:
248 Argyle Street South
Caledonia ON  N3W 1K7
Phone Number: (289) 757-2287

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEPHEN TYTUS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYTUS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 24 Oct 2011 to 15 Jan 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 16 Jan 2012 to 21 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 22 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 20 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2014