skip to content

Tyrrell, Rachel Ruth

CPSO#: 96877

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Oct 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
12 Elliot Street
Perth ON  K7H 3A3
Phone: (613) 267-1660
Fax: (613) 201-3745 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

6130 Hazeldean Rd.
Stittsville K2S 2M2
Canada
Phone: 613-903-6949
Fax: 613-319-8021
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Derek J. Tyrrell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2018
Corporation Name: Dr. Rachel R. Tyrrell Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 14 2021

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL RUTH TYRRELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYRRELL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2011 to 16 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Oct 2012 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013