skip to content

Tyndel, Felix Joseph

CPSO#: 31763

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jul 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 38094
RPO Castlewood
Toronto ON  M5N 3A8
Phone: 416-773-0418 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: F. Tyndel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Tyndel ( CPSO# 31763 )

Business Address:
PO Box 38094 Rpo Castlewood
Toronto ON  M5N 3A8
Phone Number: 416-773-0418

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective:18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FELIX JOSEPH TYNDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYNDEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1980