skip to content

Tyler, James Barry

CPSO#: 97465

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Apr 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Ross University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Tyler Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 18 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: 125 Bell Farm Rd Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Date Received: 16 May 2019


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Apr 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Sep 2013
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 02 Oct 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019