skip to content

Tylee, Michael James

CPSO#: 91490

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesia
University Health Network
Toronto General Hospital
200 Elizabeth Street, 3EN-464
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5164 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JAMES TYLEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TYLEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014