skip to content

Tyan, Chung Chun

CPSO#: 91893

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 1) 800 Danforth Rd Scarborough, ON M1K 1H8 2) 294 Main St Suite 301 Toronto, ON M4C 4X5
Date Received: 05 Jun 2017


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:21 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2009 to 24 Oct 2009
AVP - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 25 Oct 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2012 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2017