skip to content

Tweed, William Arnold

CPSO#: 19873

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 19 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 06 Sep 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 1982
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jul 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012