skip to content

Tuters, Kaspars

CPSO#: 19088

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Latvian

Education:University of Toronto, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients can email their requests to k.tuters@utoronto.ca
Date Received: 17 Apr 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2019