skip to content

Turpie, Irene Drummond

CPSO#: 26199

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Aug 1981
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 1981

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow School of Medicine, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Melville St
Dundas
Dundas ON  L9H 1Z8
Phone: (905) 317-2093 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Medicine ( Geriatrics
Hanilton General Hospital
237 Barton street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Uganda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:09 Jun 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective:07 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. IRENE DRUMMOND TURPIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURPIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1973
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 1981