skip to content

Turner, Paul Vincent

CPSO#: 29405

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 02 Oct 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 02 Oct 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul V. Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 26 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Perth Medical Clinic 14 Isabella Street Perth ON K7H 2W6
Date Received: 23 Oct 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Oct 2019