skip to content

Turner, Lary James

CPSO#: 17948

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Dec 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Lary J. Turner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 25 2011

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1966 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Oct 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Dec 2010