skip to content

Turkistani, Yosra Abdulahad A

CPSO#: 88261

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:08 Oct 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:05 Nov 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2008 to 23 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jun 2008 to 23 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 24 Jun 2009 to 08 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 08 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Oct 2010 to 08 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Oct 2011 to 08 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Jan 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 08 Jan 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Cardiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2016