skip to content

Turek, Michele Anna

CPSO#: 30114

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Medicine
Ottawa Hospital
General Site
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8810
Fax: (613) 739-6727 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michele Turek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 4 2019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1984 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHELE ANNA TUREK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUREK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Mar 1981
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1991