skip to content

Tureanu, Luminita Mihaela

CPSO#: 87498

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Cluj, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 May 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
CF - Anesthesiology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010