skip to content

Tunis, Adam Scranton

CPSO#: 90707

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Oct 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Department of Medical Imaging
4001 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

York Radiology
1333 Sheppard Ave E, Ste 125
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Canada
Phone: 416-494-0030
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1100 Sheppard Ave E
North York ON  M2K 2W1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adam Tunis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Tunis ( CPSO# 90707 )

Business Address:
York Radiology
100 - 1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2J 1V1
Phone Number: (416) 494-8800

Business Address:
103 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W2
Phone Number: (416) 494-8800

Business Address:
NYGH Branson
555 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M2R 1N5
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Department of Medical Imaging
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADAM SCRANTON TUNIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUNIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2014