skip to content

Tuma, Mazin Ahmed Murtadha

CPSO#: 100544

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Dec 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAZIN AHMED MURTADHA TUMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 19 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2018