skip to content

Tulloch, Trisha Dee-Ann

CPSO#: 94060

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Howard University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Health System
Galaxy 12 Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7476 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Concurrent Youth Unit
CAMH
80 Workman Way - 4th floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Canada
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 39100
Fax: (416) 583-1205
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Ave, Toronto, ON
M5G 1X8
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. T. Tulloch Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Tulloch ( CPSO# 94060 )

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Health System
Galaxy 12 Clinic
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone Number: (416) 281-7476

Business Address:
80 Workman Way
4rth Floor
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8

Business Address:
201 Chester Le Boulevard
Toronto ON  M1W 2K7

Business Address:
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Scarborough Health Network, Centenary Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:13 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Adolescent Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TRISHA DEE-ANN TULLOCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TULLOCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Adolescent Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Adolescent Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
CF - Adolescent Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2014