Tucker, Matthew Adam (CPSO#: 96126)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Feb 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Feb 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Garrison Petawawa
Building N109 (Base Medical Clinic)
PO Box 9999 Station Main
2 Field Ambulance
Petawawa ON  K8H 2X3
Phone: (613) 687-5511
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Deep River and District Hospital
117 Banting Drive
Deep River ON  K0J 1P0
Canada
Phone: (613) 584-3333
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Deep River and District Hospital Deep River

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MATTHEW ADAM TUCKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TUCKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2014