skip to content

Tu, Hin Yu Vincent

CPSO#: 95356

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, French

Education:McGill University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 216
16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1
Phone: (905) 853-7468 Ext. 0
Fax: (905) 836-9038 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tu Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Tu ( CPSO# 95356 )
Dr. J. Li ( CPSO# 97827 )

Business Address:
216 - 16700 Bayview Avenue
Newmarket ON  L3X 1W1

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9

Business Address:
Markham Stoufville Hospital
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3

Business Address:
Suite 402
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HIN YU VINCENT TU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016