skip to content

Tsvetkova, Elena Valentinovna

CPSO#: 87211

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Riga Stradins University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
A3-917
800 Commissioners Rd E
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8640 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Elena Tsvetkova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 21 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tsvetkova ( CPSO# 87211 )

Business Address:
A3-917
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8640

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:11 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELENA VALENTINOVNA TSVETKOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSVETKOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012