skip to content

Tsvetkov, Dmitry

CPSO#: 92945

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1971 Queen St East
Suite 106
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Phone: 416-479-1623
Fax: 647-689-7289 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Dmitry Tsvetkov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Tsvetkov ( CPSO# 92945 )

Business Address:
1971 Queen Street East
Suite 106
Toronto ON  M4L 1H9
Phone Number: (416) 479-1623

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DMITRY TSVETKOV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSVETKOV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015