skip to content

Katsuta, Tsuyoshi

CPSO#: 62537

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese

Education:University Of Toronto, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Enhanced Care Clinic
3857 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8W 0A2
Phone: (416) 354-2640
Fax: (647) 729-2008 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lawrence Warden Medical Centre
2050A Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1R 2Z5
Canada
Phone: (416) 752-2207
Fax: 4167520636
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TSUYOSHI KATSUTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KATSUTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 11 Jun 1990 to 17 Jun 1991
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1991