skip to content

Tsui, Simon Yee Tuen

CPSO#: 86934

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Aug 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Tsui, Yee Tuen (used until: 27 Oct 2008 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English

Education:Chinese University of Hong Kong, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
10-78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone: (416) 279-0855 Ext. 245
Fax: (416) 279-0857 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Scarborough Hospital
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
Phone: (416) 495-2465
Fax: (416) 495-2420
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

The Scarborough Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
Phone: (416) 431-8101
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Simon Y. T. Tsui Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tsui ( CPSO# 86934 )

Business Address:
10 - 78 Corporate Drive
Scarborough ON  M1H 3G4
Phone Number: (416) 479-0855

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W2
Phone Number: (416) 495-2465

Business Address:
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8101


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Hong Kong S A R

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:19 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIMON YEE TUEN TSUI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSUI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 28 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 29 Jul 2008 to 02 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 03 Nov 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2009