skip to content

Tsoi, Kim

CPSO#: 88871

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Suite 476-600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 4586
Fax: 416-586-8397 Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIM TSOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2019