skip to content

Tsoi, Christopher Sze-Chung

CPSO#: 92838

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: (289) 269-1522
Fax: (905) 303-9773 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Christopher Tsoi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tsoi ( CPSO# 92838 )

Business Address:
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (289) 269-1522

Business Address:
Suite 400
1 Valleybrook Drive
North York ON  M3B 2S7
Phone Number: (416) 386-9761

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER SZE-CHUNG TSOI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSOI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013