skip to content

Tsirigotis, Dimitrios

CPSO#: 93845

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Greek

Education:Yale University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3900 Kresge Way
Suite 46
Louisville KY  40207
United States
Phone: 502-899-3858

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Indiana
USA - Kentucky

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DIMITRIOS TSIRIGOTIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIRIGOTIS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 2017