skip to content

Tsien, Cynthia

CPSO#: 90027

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
500 University Ave
Toronto General Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Phone: 416-340-6862
Fax: 416-340-3954 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Cynthia Tsien Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tsien ( CPSO# 90027 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Box 255
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Gastroenterology Effective:20 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CYNTHIA TSIEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSIEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 17 Nov 2008 to 12 Dec 2008
EL - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 01 Oct 2010
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Dec 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Oct 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012