skip to content

Tseng, Renee Yin-Kai

CPSO#: 96598

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Maxum Professional Centre
385 Silver Star Blvd
Suite 306
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone: 416-291-1284
Fax: 416-291-8696 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Renee Tseng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 08 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tseng ( CPSO# 96598 )

Business Address:
Maxum Professional Centre
Suite 306
385 Silver Star Boulevard
Scarborough ON  M1V 0E3
Phone Number: (416) 291-1284

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RENEE YIN-KAI TSENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 07 Nov 2011 to 15 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 16 Jul 2012 to 15 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 16 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2014