skip to content

Tseng, Eric Kuo

CPSO#: 93129

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's Hospital
2-084 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5128
Fax: 416-864-3055 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Eric K. Tseng Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 14 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Tseng ( CPSO# 93129 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
2- 084 Donnelly Wing
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5389

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 04 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ERIC KUO TSENG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSENG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014