skip to content

Tse Hing Yuen, Stephanie

CPSO#: 94526

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 07 Nov 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health centre
Department of Medicine
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: 905-895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tse Hing Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Tse Hing Yuen ( CPSO# 94526 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Nov 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE TSE HING YUEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSE HING YUEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2012