skip to content

Tsang, Monica Chiu Wen

CPSO#: 99403

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Nov 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Alberta, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
28 South Unionville Ave. Unit 2088
Markham ON  L3R4P9
Phone: (905) 477-7880
Fax: (905) 477-4656 Electoral District: 05

Medical Records Location

Address: Unit 110 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West Vaughan, ON L4A 4P9
Date Received: 30 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MONICA CHIU WEN TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2015