skip to content

Tsang, Michael Brennon

CPSO#: 86949

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines Hospital
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone: (905) 378-4647 Ext. 46761
Fax: (289) 398-1017 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Michael Brennon Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Tsang ( CPSO# 86949 )

Business Address:
No business address available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:03 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL BRENNON TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2012