skip to content

Tsang, Gordon Fung-Zak

CPSO#: 98351

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
128 Pine St
Suite 203A
Sudbury ON  P3C 1X3
Phone: 705-479-1706
Fax: 705-675-7330 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Specialty Clinics
Sensenbrenner Hospital
101 Progress Crescent
Kapuskasing ON  P5N 3H5
Canada
Phone: 705-337-4013
Fax: 705-337-4036
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

845 Regent Street
Suite 101
Sudbury ON  P3E 4T3
Canada
Phone: 705-479-1706
Fax: 705-675-7330
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gordon Tsang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Tsang ( CPSO# 98351 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8899

Business Address:
203-128 Pine St
Sudbury ON  P3C 1X3
Phone Number: 705-479-1706


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GORDON FUNG-ZAK TSANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Aug 2020
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017