skip to content

Tsandelis, Nickoli

CPSO#: 31274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Dec 1979
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Dec 1979

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Greek

Education:Western University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6-420 Erb St W
Waterloo ON  N2L 6H6
Phone: 5197421090
Fax: 5197418929 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nick Tsandelis Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Tsandelis ( CPSO# 31274 )

Business Address:
201 - 535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 742-1090

Business Address:
6-420 Erb St. W.
Waterloo ON  N2L H6
Phone Number: 5197421090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:07 Jun 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICKOLI TSANDELIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TSANDELIS is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Dec 1979

Concerns

Source: Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 17, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: This matter has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)