skip to content

Tsai, Shian-Yih

CPSO#: 22013

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 26 Jun 1969

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Japanese

Education: National Taiwan University, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Wilson Medical Centre
130 Wilson Street
Hamilton ON  L8R 1E2

Tel: (905) 526-6250
Toll Free: 1 866-525-5434
Fax: (905) 526-9745
Date Received: 02 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:20 Nov 1968 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016