skip to content

Tsai, Judy Peih-Ying

CPSO#: 96625

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 14 Aug 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:Northwestern University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Judy Peih-Ying Tsai Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 10 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: 10 Trench St Richmond Hill, ON L4C 4Z3
Date Received: 23 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 May 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 25 Aug 2011
EL - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2015
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 14 Aug 2018