skip to content

Tsai, Jenny Peih-Chir

CPSO#: 91059

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 15 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Mandarin

Education:McGill University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus C2-182 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 23 May 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2017