skip to content

Trusdale, Terry Niall Weston

CPSO#: 28736

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Sep 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Sep 1976
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Hospital
35 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone: (807) 343-2431 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

Aviation Centre of Excellence
2003 Derek Burney Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7K 1J4
Canada
Phone: (807) 474-2013
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Confederation College
P O Box 398
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 4W1
Canada
Phone: (807) 475-6169
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Terry Trusdale Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Trusdale ( CPSO# 28736 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Hospital
35 North Algoma Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 5G7
Phone Number: (807) 343-2431

Business Address:
2003 Derek Burney Drive
Thunder Bay ON  P7K 1J4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TERRY NIALL WESTON TRUSDALE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUSDALE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 1976

Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

On March 22, 2013, at the Ontario Superior Court of Justice in Thunder Bay, a finding of Professional Negligence was made against Dr. Trusdale in respect of an incident that took place in April 2008.