skip to content

Truong, Wayne

CPSO#: 88454

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 19 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:15 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Surgery Effective:28 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
EL - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2008 to 19 Oct 2008
EL - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2008