skip to content

Truong, Long Phuoc Tuong

CPSO#: 93617

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 04 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Vietnamese

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone: (613) 732-2811
Fax: (613) 732-6351 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
Phone: (613) 756-3045
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Long P.T. Truong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Truong ( CPSO# 93617 )

Business Address:
Pembroke Regional Hospital
705 MacKay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G8
Phone Number: (613) 732-2811

Business Address:
St. Francis Memorial Hospital
7 St Francis Memorial Drive
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Phone Number: (613) 756-3045

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LONG PHUOC TUONG TRUONG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TRUONG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2013